IL HB0037 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax checkoff for the Mental Health Income Tax Checkoff Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund may be used by the Department of Human Services for the purpose of making grants to providers of mental health services in the State. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-CHECKOFF-MENTAL HEALTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee |
2023-02-21 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2022-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.990 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-116 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 507MMM | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=37&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB0037.htm |