IL HB0016 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a school board may create a committee on the retention of students, consisting of the district superintendent or his or her designee, a district administrator who directs student instruction and curriculum, a principal, and a teacher. Provides that prior to retention in a grade, a school may submit, by a date as set by the committee, the names of all students determined by the school to not qualify for promotion to the next higher grade and the reason for that determination. Requires the committee to review the school's decision to retain with respect to each student and make a final decision regarding whether or not to retain a particular student. Requires the committee to take into consideration the performance evaluation of the student's teacher or teachers. Provides that the committee may vote to prohibit the school district from retaining the student if the committee determines that the student is being retained due to inadequate instruction, resources, or facilities provided by the school district or due to the student having an undiagnosed learning disability. Amends the Children with Disabilities Article to provide that a child with a learning disability must not be denied promotion, graduation, or a general diploma on the basis of failing a minimal competency test when such failure can be directly related to the disabling condition of the student. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-COMM RETENTION STUDENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-02-11 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2013-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-03-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 013-000-000 |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2012-12-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 10-20.9a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 14-6.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.48 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=16&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB0016.htm |