IL HB0013 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code, the Pharmacy Practice Act, and the Wholesale Drug Distribution Licensing Act. Prohibits the licensure, transference, use, or sale of any records relative to prescription information containing patient-identifiable or prescriber-identifiable data by any licensee or registrant of the Acts for commercial purposes.
Title
PRESCRIPTION DATA PRIVACY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-03-19 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-19 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-19 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 512-4.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 120 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 85 | 15.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |