IL HB0012 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-9)
Status: Passed on August 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-9)
Status: Passed on August 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public schools, public universities, and public community colleges in Illinois. Provides that an employee of a school district, public university, or community college district who has been employed for at least 12 months and who has worked at least 1,000 hours in the previous 12-month period shall be eligible for family and medical leave under the same terms and conditions as leave provided to eligible employees under the federal Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993.
Title
EDUC-FAMILY LEAVE ELIGIBILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0335 |
2021-08-10 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-003-000 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 012-003-000 |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-014-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-011-000 |
2021-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-02-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-02-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-02-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24-6.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 305 | 120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-220 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 3-29.1a | New Code | See Bill Text |