IL HB0010 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
Pending: House Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall compile and publish a disparity study by December 31, 2022 that evaluates whether there exists discrimination in the State's beauty supply industry and, if so, evaluates the impact of such discrimination on the State and includes recommendations for reducing or eliminating any identified barriers to entry in the beauty supply industry and discriminatory behavior. Provides that the Department shall forward a copy of its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly and the Governor. Provides that the Department may compile, collect, or otherwise gather data necessary for the administration of the study and to carry out the Department's duty relating to the recommendation of policy changes. Requires the Department to compile all of the data into a single report, submit the report to the Governor and the General Assembly, and publish the report on its website. Provides that the amendatory Act is repealed on December 31, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BEAUTY SUPPLY DISPARITY STUDY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
2021-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2254104-30New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback