IL HB0002 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0047
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0047
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Grant Funds Recovery Act. Adds to the list of requirements on a grant application. Provides that a grant agreement must contain proof of either the existence of a line of credit or the financial solvency of the grantee. Prohibits the award of a grant if a family relationship exists between the grantee or its leadership and the funding agency. Provides that all administrators and service providers must be appropriately credentialed in their respective fields. Sets requirements concerning quarterly updates and reports to the grantor agency. Provides that if the funds received from the grant are used to provide State services, then the clients for recipients of those services may not be charged an additional fee for those services.
Title
GRANT FUNDS RECOVERY ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0047 |
2013-07-01 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2013 |
2013-07-01 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2013 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 014-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2013-04-16 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-04-16 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-04-08 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel |
2013-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000 |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2012-12-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 705 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 705 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 705 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |