ID SJR104 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATURE -- Proposes an amendment to the state constitution to limit the length of any extraordinary or special session of the Legislature.
Title
Proposes an amendment to the state constitution to limit the length of any extraordinary or special session of the Legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2024-02-02 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-02-01 | Senate | to House |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Read third time in full -- ADOPTED 25-10-0 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |