ID SJR104 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ARRESTS -- Proposing an amendment to Section 17, Article I, of the Constitution of the State of Idaho to provide that an officer may make a warrantless arrest based on probable cause for an offense committed outside of the officer's presence.
Title
Proposing an amendment to Section 17, Article I, of the Constitution of the State of Idaho to provide that an officer may make a warrantless arrest based on probable cause for an offense committed outside of the officer's presence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Read third time in full -- FAILED 17-15-3 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |