ID SJM104 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-25 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/28/16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-25 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/28/16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AQUATIC INVASIVE SPECIES PREVENTION - Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that Congress ensure the continued appropriation of funds in the fiscal year 2017 budget to significantly enhance aquatic invasive species prevention efforts and to implement the intent of the Water Resources Reform and Development Act.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that Congress ensure the continued appropriation of funds in the fiscal year 2017 budget to significantly enhance aquatic invasive species prevention efforts and to implement the intent of the Water Resources Reform and Development Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/28/16 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2016-03-25 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | House | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2016-03-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-17 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-16 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 14, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 7, 2016 |
2016-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-02 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2016-02-18 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | to House |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-02-17 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Read in full |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2016/SJM104.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2016/SJM104.pdf |