ID SCR148 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/24/14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/24/14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating legislative findings and approving and extending temporary rules reviewed by the Legislature.
Title
Stating legislative findings and approving and extending temporary rules reviewed by the Legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/24/14 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2014-03-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | House | ADOPTED -- 63-6-1 |
2014-03-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-03-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2014-03-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-12 | Senate | ADOPTED -- 34-0-1 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Read in full |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |