ID SCR141 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Read First Time, Referred to Business
Pending: House Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DIVISION OF BUILDING SAFETY -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Division of Building Safety relating to Safety and Health Rules for Places of Public Employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Division of Building Safety relating to Safety and Health Rules for Places of Public Employment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseRead First Time, Referred to Business
2018-03-08HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-07Senateto House
2018-03-07SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-07SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-06SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback