ID SCR140 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/24/16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/24/16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION - RULE REJECTION - Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule docket of the State Board of and State Department of Education relating to Rules Governing Thoroughness.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule docket of the State Board of and State Department of Education relating to Rules Governing Thoroughness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/24/16 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2016-03-23 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-22 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-22 | House | ADOPTED -- 59-5-6 |
2016-03-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-17 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-16 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 14, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 7, 2016 |
2016-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-02 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-29 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 29, 2016 |
2016-02-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2016-02-18 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | to House |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-02-17 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Read in full |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |