ID SCR136 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/14/14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/14/14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule docket of the Department of Agriculture relating to Rules Governing Noxious Weed Free Gravel and Rock Products.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule docket of the Department of Agriculture relating to Rules Governing Noxious Weed Free Gravel and Rock Products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/14/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2014-03-14 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-12 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-12 | House | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2014-03-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-03-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 10, 2014 |
2014-03-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral |
2014-02-24 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2014-02-24 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-02-21 | Senate | to House |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-02-21 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read in full |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/SCR136.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/SCR136.pdf |