ID SCR134 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY TAXES -- Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing a legislative interim study committee on property taxes.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing a legislative interim study committee on property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2020-03-13 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2020-03-11 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-11 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 65-1-4 |
2020-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-03-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-03-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-05 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-21 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2020-02-21 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED 34-0-1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |