ID SCR133 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
Pending: House Resources and Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FISH AND GAME RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Department of Fish and Game relating to Rules Governing Licensing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Department of Fish and Game relating to Rules Governing Licensing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2018-02-21HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-20Senateto House
2018-02-20SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-20SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-02-13SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback