ID SCR132 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Legislative Council to appoint a committee to undertake and complete a study of the Idaho Content Standards.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Legislative Council to appoint a committee to undertake and complete a study of the Idaho Content Standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2020-03-18 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2020-03-17 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-17 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-17 | House | Previously Read in Full -- ADOPTED 57-9-4 |
2020-03-17 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2020-03-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2020-02-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2020-02-12 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED 31-3-1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |