ID SCR130 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BILL RODEN -- Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring Bill Roden for his commitment and contributions to the people and the State of Idaho and designating the lobbyist lounge in the Capitol Building as the Bill Roden Memorial Lounge.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring Bill Roden for his commitment and contributions to the people and the State of Idaho and designating the lobbyist lounge in the Capitol Building as the Bill Roden Memorial Lounge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2020-03-16 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2020-03-12 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-12 | House | Previously Read in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2020-03-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2020-03-11 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-25 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2020-02-25 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED 33-0-2 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |