ID SCR126 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-26 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-26 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CONCURRENT RESOLUTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing and honoring Lewis-Clark State College for its historical roots, educational accomplishments past and present and lifelong learning opportunities for the students of today and tomorrow.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing and honoring Lewis-Clark State College for its historical roots, educational accomplishments past and present and lifelong learning opportunities for the students of today and tomorrow.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2018-01-26 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-01-23 | House | to Senate |
2018-01-23 | House | Title apvd |
2018-01-23 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 70-0-0 |
2018-01-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-01-19 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-01-19 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-01-18 | Senate | to House |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Read in full |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |