ID SCR120 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - Rpt delivered to Secretary of State on 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - Rpt delivered to Secretary of State on 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting application to appropriate water for minimum lake level relating to Cocolalla Lake in Bonner County.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting application to appropriate water for minimum lake level relating to Cocolalla Lake in Bonner County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Rpt delivered to Secretary of State on 03/26 | |
2012-03-26 | To Secretary of State | |
2012-03-23 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-22 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-22 | To enrol | |
2012-03-21 | to Senate | |
2012-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-21 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- 62-0-8 | |
2012-03-15 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-15 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-14 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-14 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-14 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-29 | to Res/Con | |
2012-02-29 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-29 | House intro | |
2012-02-28 | to House | |
2012-02-28 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-28 | Siddoway | |
2012-02-28 | voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2012-02-28 | ADOPTED | |
2012-02-28 | 10th Ord | |
2012-02-27 | to 10th Ord | |
2012-02-27 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-27 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-15 | Ref'd to Res/Env | |
2012-02-14 | to 10th Ord | |
2012-02-14 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-13 | to printing | |
2012-02-13 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-13 | Senate intro |