ID SCR119 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 04/08/15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 04/08/15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION - RULE REJECTION - Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule docket of the State Board of and State Department of Education relating to Rules Governing Uniformity.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule docket of the State Board of and State Department of Education relating to Rules Governing Uniformity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 04/08/15 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2015-04-07 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2015-04-01 | House | to Senate |
2015-04-01 | House | Title apvd |
2015-04-01 | House | ADOPTED -- 69-0-1 |
2015-04-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-31 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-30 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2015-03-19 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-18 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read in full |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |