ID SCR110 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

POST-TRAUMATIC STRESS INJURY -- Stating findings of the Legislature, declaring June as Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month, declaring June 27 as Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day and urging the Department of Health and Welfare and the Division of Veterans Services to educate people about post-traumatic stress injury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature, declaring June as Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month, declaring June 27 as Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day and urging the Department of Health and Welfare and the Division of Veterans Services to educate people about post-traumatic stress injury.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-24HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2017-02-24HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2017-02-23Senateto House
2017-02-23SenateTitle apvd
2017-02-23SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2017-02-22SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2017-02-21SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback