ID SCR107 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State on 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State on 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and approving administrative rules that impose a fee or charge, with a stated exception, and rejecting agency rules that are not approved by this or by separate concurrent resolution.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and approving administrative rules that impose a fee or charge, with a stated exception, and rejecting agency rules that are not approved by this or by separate concurrent resolution.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Secretary of State on 04/08 | |
2011-04-07 | To Secretary of State | |
2011-04-07 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-07 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-07 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-07 | To enrol | |
2011-04-07 | to Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-07 | McGeachin | |
2011-04-07 | 65-1-4 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Block, Bolz, Buckner-Webb(McCoy), Burgoyne, Chadderdon(Chadderdon), Chew, Collins, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs(Wheeler), Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Stevenson, Takasugi(Batt), Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Crane Absent and excused -- Black, Boyle, Shepherd, Smith(24) Floor Sponsor | |
2011-04-07 | ADOPTED | |
2011-04-07 | Rls susp | |
2011-04-07 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-04-07 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-06 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-06 | rec d/p | |
2011-04-06 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-01 | to St Aff | |
2011-03-01 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-01 | House intro | |
2011-02-28 | to House | |
2011-02-28 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-28 | McKenzie | |
2011-02-28 | voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2011-02-28 | ADOPTED | |
2011-02-28 | 10th Ord | |
2011-02-25 | to 10th Ord | |
2011-02-25 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-24 | to printing | |
2011-02-24 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-24 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2011/SCR107.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2011/SCR107.pdf |