ID SCR102 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TRANSPORTATION - Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that the Joint Legislative Oversight Committee direct the Office of Performance Evaluations to manage an independent evaluation of LHTAC by a qualified, out-of-state consultant or consultants.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that the Joint Legislative Oversight Committee direct the Office of Performance Evaluations to manage an independent evaluation of LHTAC by a qualified, out-of-state consultant or consultants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-30 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 30, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 23, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-17 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-09 | Senate | ADOPTED -- 35-0-0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read in full |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |