ID SCR101 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DISASTER EMERGENCIES -- States findings of the Legislature to provide that the state of disaster emergency declared by the Governor regarding novel coronavirus or COVID-19 is terminated, to provide that receipt of federal funds, benefits, or resources arising out of the state of disaster emergency shall not be affected, and to provide that the Governor may make or maintain declarations only to a certain extent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

States findings of the Legislature to provide that the state of disaster emergency declared by the Governor regarding novel coronavirus or COVID-19 is terminated, to provide that receipt of federal funds, benefits, or resources arising out of the state of disaster emergency shall not be affected, and to provide that the Governor may make or maintain declarations only to a certain extent.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-01-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2021-01-14SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback