ID S1429 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Signed by Governor on 03/31/16 Session Law Chapter 323 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Signed by Governor on 03/31/16 Session Law Chapter 323 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - EDUCATIONAL EFFORT - Appropriates a total of $9,979,000 to the Idaho Commission for Libraries, Community Colleges, the Superintendent of Public Instruction, the Office of the State Board of Education, and the STEM Action Center for fiscal year 2017; and authorizes one additional full-time equivalent position.
Title
Appropriates a total of $9,979,000 to the Idaho Commission for Libraries, Community Colleges, the Superintendent of Public Instruction, the Office of the State Board of Education, and the STEM Action Center for fiscal year 2017; and authorizes one additional full-time equivalent position.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/31/16 Session Law Chapter 323 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on 03/28/16 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-25 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | House | Malek |
2016-03-24 | House | 62-3-5 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rudolph, Scott, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- McMillan, Nate, Nielsen Absent -- Bateman, Kloc, Rubel, Rusche, Shepherd Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | House | PASSED |
2016-03-24 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 64 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 6, read three times |
2016-03-24 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-24 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-03-24 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Mortimer |
2016-03-24 | Senate | 33-2-0 AYES -- Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Rohn(Buckner-Webb), Burgoyne, Davis, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- Den Hartog, Nuxoll Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | PASSED |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported Printed; filed for second reading |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |