ID S1421 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Session Law Chapter 254 Effective: 03/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Session Law Chapter 254 Effective: 03/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- DIVISION OF PUBLIC WORKS -- Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Administration for the Division of Public Works for fiscal year 2022.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Administration for the Division of Public Works for fiscal year 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 254 Effective: 03/25/2022 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2022-03-25 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2022-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-24 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-24 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |