ID S1416 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PROPERTY TAXES -- Amends existing law to increase the homeowner exemption to $120,000 and restore the inflation index.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to increase the homeowner exemption to $120,000 and restore the inflation index.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19SenateReferred to State Affairs
2020-03-18SenateRetained on calendar
2020-03-17SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-03-16SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-03-13SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2020-03-13SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback