ID S1415 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Signed by Governor on 03/31/16 Session Law Chapter 336 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Signed by Governor on 03/31/16 Session Law Chapter 336 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY DEPARTMENT - Appropriates $67,332,600 to the Department of Environmental Quality for fiscal year 2017; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 372; transfers $1.5 million from the Water Pollution Control Fund to the Environmental Remediation Basin Fund; expresses legislative intent regarding an annual report; and expresses legislative intent regarding uses of the Water Pollution Control Fund.
Title
Appropriates $67,332,600 to the Department of Environmental Quality for fiscal year 2017; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 372; transfers $1.5 million from the Water Pollution Control Fund to the Environmental Remediation Basin Fund; expresses legislative intent regarding an annual report; and expresses legislative intent regarding uses of the Water Pollution Control Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/31/16 Session Law Chapter 336 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on 03/28/16 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-25 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | House | Burtenshaw |
2016-03-24 | House | 56-13-1 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Bateman, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gibbs, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Smith, Thompson, Troy, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Batt, Gestrin, Harris, Loertscher, McMillan, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Trujillo Absent -- Perry Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | House | PASSED |
2016-03-24 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2016-03-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-23 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-23 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-03-22 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Bair |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 34-0-1 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Rohn(Buckner-Webb), Burgoyne, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Anthon Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-22 | Senate | PASSED |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |