ID S1413 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Signed by Governor on 03/31/16 Session Law Chapter 312 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Signed by Governor on 03/31/16 Session Law Chapter 312 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - HEALTH AND WELFARE - INDEPENDENT COUNCILS/INDIRECT SUPPORT SERVICES/HEALTHCARE POLICY INITIATIVES/LICENSING AND CERTIFICATION - Appropriates $67,479,300 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the divisions of Independent Councils, Indirect Support Services, Healthcare Policy Initiatives and Licensing and Certification for fiscal year 2017; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 376.5; provides for General Fund transfers to the Cooperative Welfare Fund; directs expenditures for trustee and benefit payments; limits services to available resources; requires a report on VOCA funds; requires a monthly Medicaid tracking report; requires a biannual Medicaid Integrity Unit report; requires quarterly transfer reports; requires monthly vacancy reports; requires a report on the implementation of the SHIP grant; and requires a report on facility licensing and certification.
Title
Appropriates $67,479,300 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the divisions of Independent Councils, Indirect Support Services, Healthcare Policy Initiatives and Licensing and Certification for fiscal year 2017; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 376.5; provides for General Fund transfers to the Cooperative Welfare Fund; directs expenditures for trustee and benefit payments; limits services to available resources; requires a report on VOCA funds; requires a monthly Medicaid tracking report; requires a biannual Medicaid Integrity Unit report; requires quarterly transfer reports; requires monthly vacancy reports; requires a report on the implementation of the SHIP grant; and requires a report on facility licensing and certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/31/16 Session Law Chapter 312 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on 03/28/16 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-25 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-23 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-23 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-23 | House | Malek |
2016-03-23 | House | 52-15-3 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, DeMordaunt, Erpelding, Gannon, Gibbs, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Chaney, Crane, Dayley, Dixon, Gestrin, Harris, McMillan, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Scott, Sims Absent -- Anderst, Shepherd, Youngblood Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-23 | House | PASSED |
2016-03-23 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 65 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 5, read three times |
2016-03-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-22 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-22 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-03-21 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-21 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
APPROPRIATIONS
HEALTH AND WELFARE
INDEPENDENT COUNCILS/INDIRECT SUPPORT SERVICES/HEALTHCARE POLICY INITIATIVES/LICENSING AND CERTIFICATION
HEALTH AND WELFARE
INDEPENDENT COUNCILS/INDIRECT SUPPORT SERVICES/HEALTHCARE POLICY INITIATIVES/LICENSING AND CERTIFICATION