ID S1410 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Signed by Governor on 04/05/16 Session Law Chapter 370 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS - MILLENNIUM FUND - Appropriates, distributes and transfers a total of $9,587,000 from the Idaho Millennium Income Fund for fiscal year 2017; provides that certain unexpended and unencumbered moneys shall revert to the Idaho Millennium Income Fund at the end of fiscal year 2017; and provides that any remaining unexpended and unencumbered moneys in the Idaho Millennium Income Fund shall be transferred to the Idaho Millennium Permanent Endowment Fund at the end of fiscal year 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates, distributes and transfers a total of $9,587,000 from the Idaho Millennium Income Fund for fiscal year 2017; provides that certain unexpended and unencumbered moneys shall revert to the Idaho Millennium Income Fund at the end of fiscal year 2017; and provides that any remaining unexpended and unencumbered moneys in the Idaho Millennium Income Fund shall be transferred to the Idaho Millennium Permanent Endowment Fund at the end of fiscal year 2017.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-05SenateSigned by Governor on 04/05/16 Session Law Chapter 370 Effective: 07/01/2016
2016-03-25SenateReported delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on 03/28/16
2016-03-25SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2016-03-25HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2016-03-24SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2016-03-24SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2016-03-23Houseto Senate
2016-03-23HouseTitle apvd
2016-03-23HouseMonks
2016-03-23House64-2-4 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, McMillan Absent -- Anderst, Chaney, Malek, Youngblood Floor Sponsor
2016-03-23HousePASSED
2016-03-23HouseRules Suspended: Ayes 65 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 5, read three times
2016-03-23HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2016-03-22HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2016-03-22HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2016-03-21Senateto House
2016-03-21SenateTitle apvd
2016-03-21SenatePASSED -- 33-0-2
2016-03-21SenateRead third time in full
2016-03-17SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2016-03-16SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2016-03-16SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2016-03-15SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback