ID S1410 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 293 Effective: 04/03/12 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/12 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 293 Effective: 04/03/12 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/12 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriating an additional $10,470,200 of federal Education Jobs Fund moneys to Public Schools for fiscal year 2012; appropriating $1,566,813,100 to Public Schools for fiscal year 2013; adjusting base and minimum salaries; providing legislative intent; and providing carryover authority of non-General Funds.
Title
Appropriating an additional $10,470,200 of federal Education Jobs Fund moneys to Public Schools for fiscal year 2012; appropriating $1,566,813,100 to Public Schools for fiscal year 2013; adjusting base and minimum salaries; providing legislative intent; and providing carryover authority of non-General Funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 293 Effective: 04/03/12 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/12 All other sections | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/29 | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-28 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-28 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-28 | To enrol | |
2012-03-27 | to Senate | |
2012-03-27 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-27 | Thompson | |
2012-03-27 | 54-15-1 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block(Block), Bolz, Boyle, Chadderdon, Collins, Crane, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Perry, Raybould, Roberts, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Stevenson, Thayn, Thompson, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chew, Cronin, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Pence, Ringo, Rusche, Smith(30), Smith(24), Trail Absent and excused -- Sims Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-27 | PASSED | |
2012-03-27 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-27 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-27 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-26 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-26 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-26 | House intro | |
2012-03-26 | to House | |
2012-03-26 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-26 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 31-4-0 | |
2012-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-22 | to Fin | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-21 | to printing | |
2012-03-21 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-21 | Senate intro |