ID S1409 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Signed by Governor on 04/04/14 Session Law Chapter 351 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Signed by Governor on 04/04/14 Session Law Chapter 351 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $3,566,600 to the State Treasurer for fiscal year 2015; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 26; provides for reappropriation authority for the LGIP Fund; provides guidance for employee compensation; provides for legislative intent regarding the use of funds spent on conference-related activities; provides legislative intent for the payment of bank service fees; and provides legislative intent regarding investment activities.
Title
Appropriates $3,566,600 to the State Treasurer for fiscal year 2015; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 26; provides for reappropriation authority for the LGIP Fund; provides guidance for employee compensation; provides for legislative intent regarding the use of funds spent on conference-related activities; provides legislative intent for the payment of bank service fees; and provides legislative intent regarding investment activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/04/14 Session Law Chapter 351 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/24/14 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | House | PASSED -- 70-0-0 |
2014-03-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-03-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-18 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |