ID S1408 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Signed by Governor on 03/31/16 Session Law Chapter 324 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Signed by Governor on 03/31/16 Session Law Chapter 324 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION FOR THE BOND PAYMENT PROGRAM - Appropriates $12,303,000 to the Department of Administration for the Bond Payment Program for fiscal year 2017.
Title
Appropriates $12,303,000 to the Department of Administration for the Bond Payment Program for fiscal year 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/31/16 Session Law Chapter 324 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on 03/28/16 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-25 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-23 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-23 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-23 | House | Gannon |
2016-03-23 | House | 66-0-4 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent -- Anderst, Chaney, Malek, Youngblood Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-23 | House | PASSED |
2016-03-23 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 65 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 5, read three times |
2016-03-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-22 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-22 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-03-21 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-21 | Senate | PASSED -- 33-0-2 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |