ID S1408 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 317 Effective: 04/05/12 Sections 1, 2 & 3; 07/01/12 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 317 Effective: 04/05/12 Sections 1, 2 & 3; 07/01/12 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates and transfers $161,000 from the Idaho Millennium Fund to the Idaho Millennium Permanent Endowment Fund for fiscal year 2012 for the purpose of repaying prior year investment management consulting fees that were paid in error from the Idaho Millennium Permanent Endowment Fund from fiscal years 2009-2011; appropriates and transfers $80,000 from the Idaho Millennium Fund to the Idaho Millennium Income Fund for appropriation to the State Treasurer for fiscal year 2012; appropriates an additional $80,000 to the State Treasurer for fiscal year 2012 to cover investment management fees for fiscal year 2012; appropriates and distributes a total of $5,714,400 from the Idaho Millennium Income Fund for fiscal year 2013; and provides that certain unexpended and unencumbered moneys shall revert to the Idaho Millennium Income Fund at the end of fiscal year 2013.
Title
Appropriates and transfers $161,000 from the Idaho Millennium Fund to the Idaho Millennium Permanent Endowment Fund for fiscal year 2012 for the purpose of repaying prior year investment management consulting fees that were paid in error from the Idaho Millennium Permanent Endowment Fund from fiscal years 2009-2011; appropriates and transfers $80,000 from the Idaho Millennium Fund to the Idaho Millennium Income Fund for appropriation to the State Treasurer for fiscal year 2012; appropriates an additional $80,000 to the State Treasurer for fiscal year 2012 to cover investment management fees for fiscal year 2012; appropriates and distributes a total of $5,714,400 from the Idaho Millennium Income Fund for fiscal year 2013; and provides that certain unexpended and unencumbered moneys shall revert to the Idaho Millennium Income Fund at the end of fiscal year 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 317 Effective: 04/05/12 Sections 1, 2 & 3; 07/01/12 All other sections | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/29 | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-28 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-28 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-28 | To enrol | |
2012-03-27 | to Senate | |
2012-03-27 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-27 | Patrick | |
2012-03-27 | 66-0-4 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block(Block), Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Chadderdon, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Burgoyne, Chew, Pence, Sims Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-27 | PASSED | |
2012-03-27 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-27 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-27 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-26 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-26 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-26 | House intro | |
2012-03-26 | to House | |
2012-03-26 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-26 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2012-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-21 | to Fin | |
2012-03-21 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-20 | to printing | |
2012-03-20 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-20 | Senate intro |