ID S1389 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Signed by Governor on 03/24/16 Session Law Chapter 208 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Signed by Governor on 03/24/16 Session Law Chapter 208 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CONCEALED WEAPONS - Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding concealed weapons; and regarding prohibited conduct.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding concealed weapons; and regarding prohibited conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/24/16 Session Law Chapter 208 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on 03/21/16 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-21 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-18 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-18 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-18 | House | Loertscher |
2016-03-18 | House | 54-15-1 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, Kerby, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Bell, Chew, Erpelding, Gannon, Jordan, King, Kloc, McCrostie, Nye, Pence, Rubel, Smith, Wills, Wintrow, Wood Absent -- Rudolph Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-18 | House | PASSED |
2016-03-18 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 55 Nays 13 Abs/Excd 2, read three times |
2016-03-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-17 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-16 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-03-16 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-16 | Senate | PASSED -- 27-8-0 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |