ID S1377 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 285 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 285 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BALLOT MEASURES -- Amends existing law to require paid signature gatherers to disclose that they are being paid and to revise provisions regarding the collection of signatures for ballot measures.
Title
Amends existing law to require paid signature gatherers to disclose that they are being paid and to revise provisions regarding the collection of signatures for ballot measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 285 Effective: 07/01/2024 |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2024-03-27 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-16-0 |
2024-03-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-03-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-03-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 25, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2024-03-06 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 26-8-1 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |