ID S1372 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FIRE PROTECTION DISTRICTS -- Adds to existing law to provide for the division of a fire protection district and to provide for elections for division of a district.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for the division of a fire protection district and to provide for elections for division of a district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-03-17 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-03-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2020-03-06 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 30-2-3 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |