ID S1371 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 328 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 328 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- CONSTITUTIONAL OFFICERS -- Appropriates additional moneys to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Secretary of State, State Controller, State Treasurer, Superintendent of Public Instruction, and Attorney General for fiscal year 2019.
Title
Appropriates additional moneys to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Secretary of State, State Controller, State Treasurer, Superintendent of Public Instruction, and Attorney General for fiscal year 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 328 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-03-22 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-03-21 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-21 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-21 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2018-03-21 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |