ID S1367 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 133 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 133 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $1,910,200 to the Executive Office of the Governor for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 26; exempts appropriation object and program transfer limitations; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Title
Appropriates $1,910,200 to the Executive Office of the Governor for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 26; exempts appropriation object and program transfer limitations; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 133 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/21 | |
2012-03-21 | To Governor | |
2012-03-20 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-19 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-19 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-19 | To enrol | |
2012-03-16 | to Senate | |
2012-03-16 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-16 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 61-3-6 | |
2012-03-09 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-09 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-08 | House intro | |
2012-03-07 | to House | |
2012-03-07 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-07 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2012-03-06 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-06 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-05 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-05 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-05 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-02 | to Fin | |
2012-03-02 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-01 | to printing | |
2012-03-01 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-01 | Senate intro |