ID S1362 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 342 Effective: 03/28/2018 SECTIONS 8-11; 07/01/2018 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- HEALTH AND WELFARE -- CHILD WELFARE/DEVELOPMENTALLY DISABLED SERVICES/SERVICE INTEGRATION -- Appropriates $115,770,100 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the divisions of Child Welfare, Services for the Developmentally Disabled, and Service Integration for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions for the three divisions to 744.51 for fiscal year 2019; provides legislative intent for fiscal year 2019; appropriates an additional $1,781,400 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the Child Welfare Program for fiscal year 2018; provides an additional 9.00 full-time equivalent positions for fiscal year 2018; requires a plan on foster care improvements; and allocates funding to the Public Health Districts for the Home Visitation Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $115,770,100 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the divisions of Child Welfare, Services for the Developmentally Disabled, and Service Integration for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions for the three divisions to 744.51 for fiscal year 2019; provides legislative intent for fiscal year 2019; appropriates an additional $1,781,400 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the Child Welfare Program for fiscal year 2018; provides an additional 9.00 full-time equivalent positions for fiscal year 2018; requires a plan on foster care improvements; and allocates funding to the Public Health Districts for the Home Visitation Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateSession Law Chapter 342 Effective: 03/28/2018 SECTIONS 8-11; 07/01/2018 all other SECTIONS
2018-03-22SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-22HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-22SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-22SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-21Houseto Senate
2018-03-21HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-21HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-20HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-20HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-19Senateto House
2018-03-19SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-19SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 32-1-2
2018-03-16SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-15SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-15SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback