ID S1351 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BICYCLES. Adds to existing law relating to motor vehicles, pedestrians and bicycles to establish the Idaho Safe Routes to School Fund, to provide for infractions and a civil penalty and to provide for expenditures from the fund.
Title
BICYCLES. Adds to existing law relating to motor vehicles, pedestrians and bicycles to establish the Idaho Safe Routes to School Fund, to provide for infractions and a civil penalty and to provide for expenditures from the fund.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate | |
2010-03-09 | 3rd rdg -- FAILED -- 7-27-1 | |
2010-03-08 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-08 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-05 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-05 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-05 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-15 | to Transp | |
2010-02-15 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-12 | to printing | |
2010-02-12 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-12 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1351.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1351.pdf |