ID S1344 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Session Law Chapter 247 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Session Law Chapter 247 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITIES -- Appropriates $576,786,400 to the State Board of Education and the Board of Regents of the University of Idaho for College and Universities and the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2019; provides certain reappropriation authority; exempts the appropriation from object and program transfer limitations; and provides legislative intent for systemwide needs.
Title
Appropriates $576,786,400 to the State Board of Education and the Board of Regents of the University of Idaho for College and Universities and the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2019; provides certain reappropriation authority; exempts the appropriation from object and program transfer limitations; and provides legislative intent for systemwide needs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 247 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-03-19 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-03-15 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-15 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-13-3 |
2018-03-14 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-03-12 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-2-0 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |