ID S1342 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to fish and game to authorize the Department of Fish and Game to require specified licensees to maintain certain records; to provide that licensees purchasing raw black bear skins, raw cougar skins or parts of black bears or cougars may be required to maintain certain records; and to provide that the department may require licensees to submit certain forms or records to the department relating to the purchase of black bears and cougars.
Title
Amends existing law relating to fish and game to authorize the Department of Fish and Game to require specified licensees to maintain certain records; to provide that licensees purchasing raw black bear skins, raw cougar skins or parts of black bears or cougars may be required to maintain certain records; and to provide that the department may require licensees to submit certain forms or records to the department relating to the purchase of black bears and cougars.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-19 | To Governor | |
2010-03-18 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-17 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-17 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-16 | To enrol | |
2010-03-15 | to Senate | |
2010-03-15 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-15 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 68-0-2 | |
2010-03-11 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-11 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-10 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-10 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-02 | to Res/Con | |
2010-03-02 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-02 | House intro | |
2010-03-01 | to House | |
2010-03-01 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-01 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2010-02-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-23 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-23 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-12 | to Res/Env | |
2010-02-12 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-11 | to printing | |
2010-02-11 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-11 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1342.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1342.pdf |