ID S1340 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Session Law Chapter 212 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Session Law Chapter 212 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
THEFT -- Amends existing law to revise the definition of “owner.”
Title
Amends existing law to revise the definition of “owner.”
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 212 Effective: 07/01/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2022-03-22 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2022-03-18 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-18 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-18 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-17 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-16 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2022-03-16 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |