ID S1339 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Ret'd to Jud
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Ret'd to Jud
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the Idaho Trade Secrets Act to revise definitions, to define a term; and to revise provisions relating to damages and fees.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the Idaho Trade Secrets Act to revise definitions, to define a term; and to revise provisions relating to damages and fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Ret'd to Jud | |
2012-03-14 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-14 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-13 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-13 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-13 | Rpt engros | |
2012-03-12 | to engros | |
2012-03-12 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-03-07 | to 14th Ord | |
2012-03-07 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-22 | to Jud | |
2012-02-22 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-21 | to printing | |
2012-02-21 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-21 | Senate intro |