ID S1333 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Session Law Chapter 150 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Session Law Chapter 150 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE -- Appropriates $10,209,400 to the Department of Insurance for fiscal year 2019; and limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 76.50.
Title
Appropriates $10,209,400 to the Department of Insurance for fiscal year 2019; and limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 76.50.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 150 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-03-13 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-03-09 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-09 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-09 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 61-2-7 |
2018-03-08 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |