ID S1318 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 169 Effective: 07/01/2020 SECTION 5; 07/01/2018 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 169 Effective: 07/01/2020 SECTION 5; 07/01/2018 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CODIFIER'S CORRECTIONS -- Amends existing law to make codifier's corrections, to provide correct code references and to remove obsolete language.
Title
Amends existing law to make codifier's corrections, to provide correct code references and to remove obsolete language.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 169 Effective: 07/01/2020 SECTION 5; 07/01/2018 all other SECTIONS |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-03-15 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-14 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2018-03-14 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2018-03-07 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |