ID S1306 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Reported out without amendments; referred to: Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Reported out without amendments; referred to: Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise definitions; to establish provisions relating to commercial learner's permits; to establish provisions relating to application for a commercial learner's permit and to establish provisions relating to a certain examination.
Title
Amends existing law to revise definitions; to establish provisions relating to commercial learner's permits; to establish provisions relating to application for a commercial learner's permit and to establish provisions relating to a certain examination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported out without amendments; referred to: Transportation |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2014-02-24 | Senate | UC to reconsider |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Held for reconsideration |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate |
2014-02-21 | Senate | FAILED -- 17-17-1 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |