ID S1301 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Signed by Governor on 04/05/16 Session Law Chapter 363 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Signed by Governor on 04/05/16 Session Law Chapter 363 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY - Adds to existing law to clarify property as community or joint property.
Title
Adds to existing law to clarify property as community or joint property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/05/16 Session Law Chapter 363 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on 03/28/16 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-25 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | House | PASSED -- 67-0-3 |
2016-03-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-07 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration |
2016-03-07 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-03-03 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-03 | Senate | PASSED -- 32-0-3 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |