ID S1288 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Signed by Governor on 03/19/14 Session Law Chapter 139 Effective: 03/19/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Signed by Governor on 03/19/14 Session Law Chapter 139 Effective: 03/19/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise a provision relating to discipline and to provide that certain conduct with a patient may be grounds for discipline.
Title
Amends existing law to revise a provision relating to discipline and to provide that certain conduct with a patient may be grounds for discipline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/19/14 Session Law Chapter 139 Effective: 03/19/2014 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/14/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-14 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-12 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-12 | House | PASSED -- 62-5-3 |
2014-03-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-03-11 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-10 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2014-03-05 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-04 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-04 | Senate | PASSED -- 33-2-0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |